Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alaska Usa Federalcredit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman& Dicker Llp, against Fonzie Mitchell, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Irma Poole Asberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIrma Poole Asberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions168 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION ON FONZIE MITCHELL BY ALASKA USA FEDERALCREDIT UNION | ||
September 24, 2020 |
HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION ON FONZIE MITCHELL BY ALASKA USA FEDERALCREDIT UNION Continued Not Heard |
||
August 31, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE. Not Applicable |
||
May 27, 2020 |
HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION ON FONZIE MITCHELL BY ALASKA USA FEDERALCREDIT UNION Continued Not Heard |
||
May 20, 2020 |
COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CHANGES TO 5/27/20 HEARING Completed |
||
May 20, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. Not Applicable |
||
April 01, 2020 |
HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION ON FONZIE MITCHELL BY ALASKA USA FEDERALCREDIT UNION Continued Not Heard |
||
March 25, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE. Not Applicable |
||
February 07, 2020 | HEARING RE: JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION SET 4/01/20 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 04 | ||
February 07, 2020 |
APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FONZIE MITCHELL BY ALASKA USA FEDERALCREDIT UNION FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE IRMA POOLE ASBERRY. Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.