Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Us Bank Trust Na, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Aldridge Pite, Llp, against All Other Persons Unknown, Claiming Any, Carolyn A Atkins, City Of Perris, David R Atkins, Eastern Municipal Water District, (total of 8) See All represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Daniel A. Ottolia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A. Ottolia Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryOther Real Property-Over $25,000 (Riverside)&Nbsp; |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions265 days |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time622 days |
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92570.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHARLES A CORREIA RE:RESPONSE TO OSC HEARING RE SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$18,863.85 BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 03/02/16 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: OSC RE:SANCTIONS SET
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/02/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHARLES A. CORREIA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00AMENDED SUMMONS FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00HEARING RE ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE SET 3/14/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04.
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF LIVE TESTIMONY; DECLARATION OF CHARLES A. CORREIA FILED
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/30/2015 OF US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00DECLARATION OF /IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION OF DEFENDANTS THE UNKNOWN HEIRS; HONORABLE JUDGE DANIEL A OTTOLIA.
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 6/30/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: APPL FOR ORDR GRANTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION SUBMITTED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00AMENDED PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 5/18/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04.
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY PULICATION FILED.
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW SET 4/17/17 AT 8:30 IN DJ302
Date: March 03, 2017JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT 04.
Date: April 21, 2017JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT 04.
Date: April 18, 2017MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$18,863.85 BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW SET 10/17/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT DJ302.
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT - DEPARTMENT 04.
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF LIVE TESTIMONY BY US BANK TRUST FILED.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT FILED 04/21/17
Date: April 21, 2017RETURNED DOCUMENT: COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHARLES A.CORREIA RE:NON APPEARANCE DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW FILED
Date: April 10, 2017RETURNED DOCUMENT: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: March 03, 2017SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF CHARLES A CORREIA FILED.
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT BY US BANK TRUST NA FILED.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND NOTICE OF HEARING RE: DEFAULT PROVE UP.
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00DECLARATION OF /IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS REQUEST FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHARLES A CORREIA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT FILED
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00DECLARATION OF CHARLES A CORREIA RE OSC AS TO FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE FILED
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.
Date: May 03, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY US BANK TRUST NA.
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO S302 FOR JUDGMENT REVIEW.
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.