Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mares, Nancy, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Community Integrated Work Program, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jenna M. Whitman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJenna M. Whitman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Initial Case Management Conference 01/12/2022 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Nancy Mares
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference 10/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Nancy Mares (Plaintiff) As to: Community Integrated Work Program, Inc. (Defendant) Document |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECLARATION OF JULIE GREEN ON BEHALF OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR, CPT GROUP, INC. Filed by: Nancy Mares (Plaintiff) Document |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Nancy Mares (Plaintiff) As to: Community Integrated Work Program, Inc. (Defendant) Document |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. BASS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT Filed by: Nancy Mares (Plaintiff) Document |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT Filed by: Nancy Mares (Plaintiff) Document |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for a PAGA Settlement Approval scheduled for 07/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/06/2022 03:00 PM Event |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for a PAGA Settlement Approval Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for a PAGA Settlement Approval) Minute Order |
|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for a PAGA Settlement Approval scheduled for 10/06/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Event |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for a PAGA Settlement Approval scheduled for 07/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 24 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.