Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ronnie Newton, Sr., filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Madden Trust Property Management, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Rights |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 25, 2022Complaint - Civil Rights Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 06/02/2022 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ronnie Newton Sr.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Complaint - Civil Rights Filed
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 07/21/2023 9:00 AM Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Failure to Comply with a Court Order} Tentative Ruling |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16 updated: Result Date to 03/24/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Failure to Comply with a Court Order scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16 Event |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Address for Ronnie Newton, Sr. (Plaintiff) updated Party |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Ronnie Newton, Sr. (Plaintiff):Middle Name: blank Party |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 03/24/2023 9:00 AM Case Management Conference} Tentative Ruling |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Order re: Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk As to: Ronnie Newton, Sr. (Plaintiff) Document |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16 updated: Result Date to 11/07/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.