Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abraham Poniente, Alece Grant, Alexander , James, Alex Camareno, Algenon Mccall, (total of 85) See All filed a(n) Product Liability case against Albertson'S Companies, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc., Combe Incorporated, Combe International Llc, Combe Labratories, Inc., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryProduct Liability |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Rejection Letter Issued on Motion to Quash
Date: October 08, 2021Answer Filed by: Walgreens Co. (Defendant)
Date: December 21, 2021Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing - Other Complaint - Produ...)
Date: October 20, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Combe Incorporated, Combe Products, Inc.
Date: October 08, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe International LLC Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe Products, Inc. Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe Incorporated Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe Labratories, Inc. Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Safeway Inc. Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Case Management Conference 10/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: August 31, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ralphs Grocery Company Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stater Bros. Markets Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Alexander
Date: August 25, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stater Bros. Markets Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Complaint - Product Liability Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Alexander
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ralphs Grocery Company Filed
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference 10/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Safeway Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe International LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cause of action Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe Labratories, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe Incorporated Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Combe Products, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 01/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2022 Event |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) Minute Order |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by: Walgreens Co. (Defendant) Document |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/12/2022 10:00 AM Event |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 01/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Event |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order re: Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) Minute Order |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 21 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/05/2021 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.