Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Deal, Shaeedah, Shaeedah Deal, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Blocker , Wayman John Iii, City Of Berkeley, Wayman John Blocker, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Answer Filed by: Wayman John Blocker, III (Defendant)
Date: November 29, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 24, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Shaeedah Deal (Plaintiff)
Date: December 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shaeedah Deal
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Berkeley Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/06/2022 03:00 PM D- 25
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
August 18, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
August 01, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 16 - Hon. Tara Desautelseffective 05/09/2022Reason: Inventory Transfer Assignment |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Edward M Morgan (Attorney):Organization Name changed from Savin Bursk Law to LAW OFFICES OF SAVIN & BURSKName Suffix: blankMiddle Name changed from M. to M Party |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Shaeedah Deal (Plaintiff) Document |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 01/06/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) scheduled for 08/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 303 Event |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 11:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.