Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fine , Walter, Walter Fine, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Mark A. Ozzello, Ozzello, Mark A., against Conservation Society Of California, represented by Ryan Mccoy, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Winifred Younge Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinifred Younge Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Continue March 16, 2022 Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 16, 2022Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 06, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other For Preliminary Approval; Case Mana...)
Date: March 07, 2023Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-03T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Motion - Other For Preliminary Approval Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other For Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-31T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Motion - Other For Preliminary Approval Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other For Preliminary Approval)
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Filed by: Walter Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement: Result: Granted Result Date: 03/07/2023
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice NOTICE RE SUBMISSION OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT TO THE LWDA Filed by: Walter Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by: Walter Fine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Walter Fine
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference 11/09/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.