Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Other Petition (Single Party) case in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Victoria Kolakowski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictoria Kolakowski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Petition (Single Party) |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Declaration in Support of Petition for Approval of Transfer of Payment Rights Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Hearing on Petn for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights Filed
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights Hearing 10/05/2021 09:30 AM D- 511
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Declaration of Payee ISO Petnr's Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of of Errata to Amended Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights Filed
Date: September 21, 2021First Amended Petition Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: October 05, 2021Declaration of Payee ISO Petitioner's Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Motion Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights Hearing Filed by J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Submission of Proof of Use of Funds Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Amended Exhibit "A" to Petition for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Petition - Other Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition for Approval for Tranfer of Payment Rights Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on Petition As to J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: October 05, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Errata Filed
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.