Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
David Livingston, Livingston , David, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joel D. Smith, Lawrence Timothy Fisher, Sean L. Litteral, against Mercedes-Benz Usa, Llc, represented by Jeffrey T Thayer, Troy M. Yoshino, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Other Commercial/Business Tor...) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 19, 2021Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by: David Livingston (Plaintiff) As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-12T00:00:00Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for David Livingston
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/04/2022 03:00 PM D- 19
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2024 | Compliance Hearing Re: Renewal of Pro Hac | ||
April 30, 2024 | Case Management Conference | ||
September 25, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
September 15, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
August 22, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
March 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | RG21109711: Livingston VS Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC 03/27/2023 Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication in Department 19 Tentative Ruling - 03/23/2023 Stephen Kaus The Hearing on Motion for Summary Adj... | |
March 27, 2023 | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication | ||
January 20, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
January 13, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
January 09, 2023 | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.