Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abderrahman Boulakdem, Ait Benali, Ferhat, Ait Rahmane, Rabah, Aklil, Karim, Bechiri, Boualem, (total of 42) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Leah Simon-Weisberg, Robert A. Salinas, Robert Salinas, Salinas, Robert, Simon-Weisberg, Leah, (total of 5) See All against 425 E. 18Th Street Associates, Lp, Luis C. Villalobos, Maria Recht, Mosser, Neveo, Neveo Mosser, (total of 11) See All represented by Jeffrey Michael Vucinich, Lloyd Theodore Scheley, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Winifred Younge Smith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinifred Younge Smith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proposed Order Application|
Date: July 06, 2021Exhibit Application|Proof of Service
Date: October 06, 2021Complex Determination Hearing 06/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Complex Designation Requested
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00TR - Motion Granted
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Answer Filed by: YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. (Defendant); YES ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: THE MOSSER COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: ABDERRAHMAN BOULAKDEM (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Updated -- Proposed Order Application|: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: ABDERRAHMAN BOULAKDEM (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 20, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: December 20, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for ABDERRAHMAN BOULAKDEM
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for ABDERRAHMAN BOULAKDEM, BOUALEM BECHIRI, CHAFIQA DAHMANE, DANIEL WEI
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference 07/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Application Re: Amend Complaint Granted
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Application Re: Amend Complaint Filed for ABDERRAHMAN BOULAKDEM, BOUALEM BECHIRI, CHAFIQA DAHMANE, D
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of ABDERRAHMAN BOULAKDEM Filed
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for YARDI SYSTEMS, INC., Y
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to 425 E. 18TH STREET ASSOCIATES, LP Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for YARDI SYSTEMS, INC., Y
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to OAK-425 E 18TH, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to LUIS C. VILLALOBOS Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Demurrer Second Amended Complaint Filed by YARDI SYSTEMS, INC., YES ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to YES ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC. Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Application Re: Extension of Time Filed for NEVEO MOSSER, THE MOSSER COMPANIES, INC., OAK-425 E 18TH
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to MARIA RECHT Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to NEVEO MOSSER Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to THE MOSSER COMPANIES, INC. Filed
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Order Extending Time for Yardi and Yes energy Management Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Com
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Order Extending Time for Yardi and Yes Energy Management Defendants to Respond to Second Amended Com
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Order to Extend Defendants Neveo Mosser, The Mosser Companies, Inc., Oak-425 E. 18th St. LLC, 425 E.
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Proof of Service
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.