Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Angulet Fitzgerald, Fitzgerald, Angulet, Fitzgerald , Thomas Iii, Thomas Fitzgerald, Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jung, Joseph, against Casey -Fogli Concrete Contractors, Inc., Castillo, Eugenio, Eugenio Castillo, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Motor Vehicle - Personal Inju...) |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)
Date: October 25, 2021Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Thomas Fitzgerald, III (Plaintiff); Angulet Fitzgerald (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Thomas Fitzgerald, III (Plaintiff); Angulet Fitzgerald (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Casey -Fogli Concrete Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Thomas Fitzgerald, III (Plaintiff); Angulet Fitzgerald (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Answer Filed by: Eugenio Castillo (Defendant); Casey -Fogli Concrete Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Thomas Fitzgerald, III (Plaintiff); Angulet Fitzgerald (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Thomas Fitzgerald III
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Thomas Fitzgerald III, Angulet Fitzgerald Filed
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Casey -Fogli Concrete Contractors, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.