Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harris, David, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Kia Motor America, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Julia Spain presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia Spain Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: August 05, 2021Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Granted
Date: August 12, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for David Harris
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to KIA Motor America, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Filed for Defendant
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Opposition to Defts. Motion to Transfer Venue Filed
Date: July 30, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.