Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bogat, Karen, Joy Smith, Karen Bogat, Kegebein , Linda, Linda Kegebein, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Drake, Kristen E., Kristen E. Drake, against Keri Raymond, Larry Raymond, Raymond , Keri, Raymond , Larry, Selborne Properties Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Joseph Jonathan Minioza, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Eumi K. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEumi K. Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryWrongful Eviction |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: December 09, 2021Order re: Non-Appearance Case Review Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 10, 2021Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)
Date: December 10, 2021Order re: Non-Appearance Case Review Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 09, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Karen Bogat
Date: May 21, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Selborne Properties Inc. Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 12/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 12/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Karen Bogat
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
January 27, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
January 23, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
December 05, 2022 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
November 14, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: Lauren Saltzman (Plaintiff); Karen Bogat (Plaintiff); Joy Smith (Plaintiff); Michelle Turner (Plaintiff); Linda Kegebein (Plaintiff) As to: Larry Raymond (Defendant); Keri Raymond (Defendant); Selborne Properties Inc. (Defendant) Document |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by: Lauren Saltzman (Plaintiff); Karen Bogat (Plaintiff); Joy Smith (Plaintiff); Michelle Turner (Plaintiff); Linda Kegebein (Plaintiff) Document |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by: Larry Raymond (Defendant); Keri Raymond (Defendant); Selborne Properties Inc. (Defendant) Document |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by: Larry Raymond (Defendant); Keri Raymond (Defendant); Selborne Properties Inc. (Defendant) Document |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by: Karen Bogat (Plaintiff); Joy Smith (Plaintiff); Michelle Turner (Plaintiff); Linda Kegebein (Plaintiff); Lauren Saltzman (Plaintiff) As to: Larry Raymond (Defendant); Keri Raymond (Defendant); Selborne Properties Inc. (Defendant) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.