Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arborland Tree Service, Inc., Arborland Tree Service, Inc., A Califronia Corporation, Mahin Rajabi, Nematollah Modarresi, Renee Young, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Other Complaint case against Arborland Tree Service, Inc., Arborland Tree Service, Inc., A Califronia Corporation, Decker Bullock Dreyfus, Inc., Joel Burns, Mahin Rajabi, (total of 10) See All represented by Albert E. Cordova, Cordova, Albert E., Ernest Montanari, Montanari, Ernest, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryOther Complaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
First Amendment to Complaint Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Arborland Tree Service, Inc.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Steven R. Young, Renee Young Filed
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Nematollah Modarresi, Mahin Rajabi
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Complaint - Other Filed
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Nahid Nassiri, Decker Bullock Dreyfus, Inc.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00First Amendment to Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to Decker Bullock Dreyfus, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mahin Rajabi Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Nahid Nassiri, Decker Bullock Dreyfus, Inc.
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Arborland Tree Service, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Arborland Tree Service, Inc.
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Steven R. Young
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Nematollah Modarresi Filed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.