Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cynthia Perez, Perez, Cynthia, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Elana R. Jacobs, Jacobs, Elana R., against Concentra Health Services, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc, Concentra, Inc., Concentra, Inc, Concentra Integrated Services, Inc., (total of 13) See All represented by Beletsis, Daphne A., Daphne A. Beletsis, Leonard, Rachel H., Rachel H. Leonard, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Statement of Geofrey Otienoh Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Cynthia Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))
Date: February 14, 2023Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 14, 2023Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Geofrey Otienoh (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Cynthia Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Elana R. Jacobs Re: Discovery Disputes Filed by: Cynthia Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: Cynthia Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by: Geofrey Otienoh (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order (Compliance Hearing re: supplemental submissions for the motio...)
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Motion to Am...)
Date: 2022-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Geofrey Otienoh (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Motion to Am...)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiff's Motion to Am...)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Motion to File Document...)
Date: 2022-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Cynthia Perez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Geofrey Otienoh (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Order re: Court Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Updated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Result: Granted Result Date: 10/26/2021
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Geofrey Otienoh Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/06/2021 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Concentra Health Services, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Concentra, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cynthia Perez
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Concentra Solutions, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Geofrey Otienoh
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Concentra Primary Care Of California Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Occupational Health Center Filed
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed (Amended)
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Concentra, Inc., Concentra Health Services, Inc., Concentra Integrated
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Geofrey Otienoh Filed
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Concentra Integrated Services, Inc Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.