Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Perez, Eric, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against 99 Cents Only Stores Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Motion Denied
Date: May 11, 2021Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to 99 Cents Only Stores LLC Filed
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Eric Perez
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: May 11, 2021Case Management Conference 06/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for 99 Cents Only Stores LLC
Date: May 14, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: May 12, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 06/15/2021 09:30 AM D- 20
Date: May 12, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.