Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Berta Cruz, Cruz, Berta, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Fpi Management, Inc., Priya Harbert Fremont I, Llc, Priya Living, Llc, Pur Vg Fremont Apartments, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 25, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 25, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Berta Cruz
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference 06/08/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Statement for Complex Determination Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Berta Cruz Filed
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Berta Cruz Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Supplemental Statement for Complex Determination Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Berta Cruz Filed
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement for Complex Determination Hearing Filed
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Berta Cruz Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complex Determination Hearing Complaint Other Real Property scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/17/2022 Event |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2022 Result Type to Held Event |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order re: Complex Determination Hearing Complaint Other Real Property Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing Complaint Other Real Property) Minute Order |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
On the Complaint filed by Cruz on 04/01/2021, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action Dismissal |
|
May 17, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
May 17, 2022 | Complex Determination Hearing Complaint Other Real Property | ||
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/17/2022 03:00 PM Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.