Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barrientos, Abelardo, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Roper Williams, Ngu, John, Neptunes Alameda, Lincoln Rosewood Group, Kim, Eugene, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: April 05, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Roper Williams Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to John Ngu Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Robert Feng Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to David Feng Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Abelardo Barrientos
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Abelardo Barrientos Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lincoln Rosewood Group Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Eugene Kim Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 08/11/2021 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Neptunes Alameda Filed
Date: July 13, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.