Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carrillo, Carlos, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Abm Industry Groups, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Order to Continue Deadline to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's PAGA Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 12, 2021Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to ABM Industry Groups, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Carlos Carrillo Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Carlos Carrillo
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, LLC
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference 06/15/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of ABM Industry Groups, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Motion Denied
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 12, 2021Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for ABM Industry Groups, L
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance Filed for Carlos Carrillo
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.