Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Npi Debt Fund I. Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hodges, Julie, Hodges, Laron, Julie Hodges, Laron Hodges, L & L Residential Properties, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Marie G. Quashnock, Quashnock, Marie G., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Laron Hodges Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 08/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Laron Hodges Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for L & L Residential Properties, LLC, Laron Hodges, Julie Hodges
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to L & L Residential Properties, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Julie Hodges Filed
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of L & L Residential Properties, LLC, Laron Hodges, Julie Hodges Filed
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for NPI Debt Fund I. LP
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
September 25, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
June 14, 2023 | Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
January 23, 2023 | Court Trial | ||
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings Ex Parte to Shorten Time scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 Event |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings To Shorten Time scheduled for 10/05/2022 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 Event |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial Filed by: NPI Debt Fund I. LP (Plaintiff) As to: L & L Residential Properties, LLC (Defendant); Laron Hodges (Defendant); Julie Hodges (Defendant) Document |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex-parte Ex-Parte Proceedings To Shorten Time scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/05/2022 02:30 PM Event |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Issued and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 518 Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.