Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maybelyn Ugale, Ugale, Maybelyn, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Fernandez, Isandra Y, Isandra Y Fernandez, against Stanford Health Care, The Hospital Committee For The Livermore-Pleasanton Areas, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maybelyn Ugale
Date: March 19, 2021Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 14, 2023Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 14, 2023Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: February 21, 2023Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Maybelyn Ugale (Plaintiff); Stanford Health Care (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Maybelyn Ugale
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Stanford Health Care Filed
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Motion Granted
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 09/28/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Order re Case Management Filed
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.