Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Auderia Chatman, Chatman, Auderia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Miguel Soto, Soto, Miguel, against General Motors Financial Company, Inc., represented by Hyman, Scott J., Scott J. Hyman, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Frank Roesch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Roesch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 22, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Auderia Chatman (Plaintiff)
Date: October 15, 2021Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 07, 2022Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Auderia Chatman
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 17
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 17
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of General Motors Financial Company, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for General Motors Financial Company, Inc.
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.