Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Campuzano, Rebecca, Kaipo Obillo, Obillo, Kaipo, Rebecca Campuzano, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ammon, Barry D, Barry D Ammon, against Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Oog, Llc, Russo, Wayne, Wayne Russo, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Eumi K. Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEumi K. Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 09, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 25, 2023Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 25, 202301/25/2023 Notice of Mediator Selection Form received.
Date: January 25, 2023Notice of Mediator Selection Form Issued by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Updated -- Order Relating Cases: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Wayne Russo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Wayne Russo (Defendant) As to: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Order Relating Cases Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Answer Filed by: Wayne Russo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by: Wayne Russo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default Filed by: Wayne Russo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by: Clerk As to: Wayne Russo (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Statement of Damages Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00General Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) Entered by: Clerk
Date: December 09, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 09, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff)
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Rejection - Request for Default/Default Clerk's Judgment Issued by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Case Management Statement of Kaipo Obillo, Rebecca Campuzano Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by: Kaipo Obillo (Plaintiff); Rebecca Campuzano (Plaintiff)
Date: November 19, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kaipo Obillo
Date: March 22, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 27, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 10/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: March 25, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: March 25, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kaipo Obillo
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/13/2021 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.