Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wu, Ziyue, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Li, Shamengna, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ziyue (David) Wu
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: March 27, 2021Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Ziyue (David) Wu
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Shamengna Li Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Case Management Statement of Ziyue (David) Wu Filed
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00General Denial To Complaint Filed for Shamengna Li
Date: March 22, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 07, 2021Initial Case Management Conference 01/12/2021 02:30 PM D- 521
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ziyue (David) Wu Filed
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Statement of Shamengna Li Filed
Date: March 23, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.