Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Bereketeab, Elsa K, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Victoria S. Kolakowski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictoria S. Kolakowski Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2020 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Management Conf Continuance 02/04/2021 09:30 AM D- 512
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank, N.A.
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Elsa K Bereketeab
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Citibank, N.A. Filed
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Elsa K Bereketeab Filed
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Citibank, N.A. Filed
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 09/28/2021 10:30 AM D- 106
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00List of Witness Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Case Management Statement of Citibank, N.A. Filed
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Received
Date: September 20, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 12, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Pltff's Exhibit List Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Elsa K Bereketeab Filed
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Elsa K Bereketeab Filed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 07/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 22
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Citibank, N.A.
Date: September 20, 2021Proof of Service by Mail on Pltff's Trial brief, Witness List , Pltff's Exhibit List, Witness List,
Date: September 21, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.