Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
United Financial Casualty Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Valdez, Joel Barragan, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: August 10, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for United Financial Casualty Company
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: June 12, 2020Initial Case Management Conference 11/23/2020 02:30 PM D- 518
Date: June 12, 2020Statement of Damages Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Proof of Service on Complaint As to Joel Barragan Valdez Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: June 10, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.