Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Faramazi , Shima, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Energy Recovery Inc, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Delbert C. Gee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelbert C. Gee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management136 days |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Time To Trial263 days |
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Shima Faramazi
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Shima Faramazi Filed
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic Mail Re: Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 514
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Energy Recovery Inc Filed
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Energy Recovery Inc Filed
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Granted in Part
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Declaration (Second) of David Gearhart ISO Deft's MSJ Filed
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic Mail Re: Tentative Case Management Order Dated 6/17/20 Filed
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 15, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Granted
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment - Dropped
Date: June 15, 2021Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order Joint Stipulation And Order To Modify Summary Judgment Deadlines Filed
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Defendant's Amended & Supplemental Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Energy Recovery Inc Filed
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service RE: Notice of Hearing of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail on Pltff's CMC Filed
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Declaration of Rahul Chandra ISO MSJ Filed
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Energy Recovery Inc
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Energy Recovery Inc Filed
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Protective Orders Filed for Energy Recovery Inc
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Energy Recovery Inc
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Declaration of Dedric Barkley ISO MSJ Filed
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fee Deposit Filed
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Shima Faramazi Filed
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Energy Recovery Inc
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.