Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jackson, Rogie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Amanda, Latricia, Amadeo, Latricia, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management326 days |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Last RefreshedJune 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: February 02, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for LATRICIA AMADEO
Date: April 05, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: June 16, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Order re: Sanctions Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for ROGIE JACKSON
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 12/15/2020 03:00 PM D- 15
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of ROGIE JACKSON Filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 16, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement of ROGIE JACKSON Filed
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: June 16, 2021Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-31T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.