Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anna Jorgensen, Jorgensen , Anna, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Anthony A. Ferrigno, Ferrigno, Anthony A., against Bac Home Loan, Lp, Bac Home Loan Servicing, Lp, Bank Of America N.A., Bank Of New York, Mellon, Bank Of New York Mellon, (total of 8) See All represented by Ekmekchyan, Pavel, Joel C. Spann, Neeru Jindal, Pavel Ekmekchyan, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Jeffrey S. Brand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey S. Brand Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management193 days |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
||
Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: April 04, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: February 28, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 27, 2020Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: October 26, 2020Proof of Service on Motion
Date: June 08, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 08, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 08, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 19, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Granted
Date: September 15, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 22, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)
Date: November 30, 2021First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint Filed by Bank of America N.A.
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 26, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: September 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: September 15, 2021Proof of Service by Electronic Service of First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 22, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 22, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: October 26, 2021Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Entered by: Clerk
Date: December 09, 2021Opposition (Opposition to Demurrer by Bank of America) Filed by: Anna Jorgensen (Plaintiff)
Date: December 28, 2021Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Issued
Date: December 19, 2019Hearing Reset to Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction 02/28/2020 10:00 AM D- 22
Date: January 03, 2020Proposed Order Application|
Date: December 18, 2019Complaint - Other Filed
Date: December 17, 2019Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: December 19, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 20, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: December 20, 2019Declaration Application|
Date: December 18, 2019Proposed Order Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Initial Case Management Conference 04/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 22
Date: December 18, 2019Case Management Statement of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC , ZBS Law , LLP Filed
Date: June 11, 2020Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: January 03, 2020Declaration Application|
Date: December 18, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: October 26, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: October 26, 2020Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Granted
Date: December 19, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed for Bank of New York Mellon
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 18, 2019Civil Ex-Parte 12/19/2019 09:15 AM D- 511
Date: December 18, 2019Stipulation and Order Re: Temporary Restraining Order Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: February 19, 2020Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: February 28, 2020Stipulation and Order Re: Temporary Restraining Order Granted
Date: February 21, 2020Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted
Date: November 02, 2020Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Date: January 27, 2021Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Bank of New York Mellon
Date: March 08, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: April 04, 2020Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 27, 2020Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: June 24, 2020Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: June 24, 2020Case Management Statement of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A., BAC Home Loan, LP Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A. Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Proposed Order Stipulation and Order|
Date: October 23, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: January 25, 2021Answer to Complaint Filed for Bank of America N.A.
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: January 25, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: May 03, 2021Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: April 26, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: June 01, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant
Date: June 08, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: May 03, 2021Opposition Motion to Leave to file First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A. Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: August 04, 2021Case Management Statement of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC Filed
Date: August 04, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 06, 2021Proposed Judgment
Date: June 08, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 21, 2021Proof of Service Opposition Filed
Date: July 26, 2021Opposition to Ex-Parte Shortening Time Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: July 14, 2021Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Reply In Support Of Judgment On The Pleadings Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: July 19, 2021Declaration in Opposition
Date: July 19, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 21, 2021Proof of Service
Date: July 19, 2021Supplement to Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Revised Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Brief (Supplemental) in support of Deft's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 26, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))
Date: January 11, 2022Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 26, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Taken Under Submission
Date: August 26, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 26, 2021Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Entered by: Clerk
Date: January 12, 2022Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 12, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Updated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Result: Granted in Part Result Date: 01/12/2022
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Updated -- Demurrer: Result: Sustained without Leave to Amend Result Date: 09/21/2022
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Bank of New York, Mellon (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...)
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Order re: Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Updated -- Demurrer: Result: Sustained without Leave to Amend Result Date: 09/21/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order Signed and Filed by: Anna Jorgensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Proposed Order: Result: Granted Result Date: 04/27/2022
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Anna Jorgensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Updated -- Demurrer: Result: Sustained without Leave to Amend Result Date: 09/21/2022
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Bank of America N.A. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte 12/19/2019 09:15 AM D- 511
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Complaint - Other Filed
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 04/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 22
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Granted
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Issued
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Bank of New York Mellon , Bayview Loan Se
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction 02/28/2020 10:00 AM D- 22
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction - Dropped
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Temporary Restraining Order Granted
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-04-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Temporary Restraining Order Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC , ZBS Law , LLP Filed
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Declaration of Nonmonetary Status Filed
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Bank of New York Mellon
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A., BAC Home Loan, LP Filed
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Bank of New York Mello
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Bank of America N.A.
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Bank of New York Mellon
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A. Filed
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon Filed
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of America N.A., BAC Home Loan, LP Filed
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Reply In Support Of Judgment On The Pleadings Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anna Jorgensen
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Leave to file First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Defendant
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Opposition to Ex-Parte Shortening Time Filed
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Proof of Service Opposition Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Revised Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Brief (Supplemental) in support of Deft's Motion for Judgment on the pleadings Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A. Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint Filed by Bank of America N.A.
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Granted
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Supplement to Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Anna Jorgensen Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Electronic Service of First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Taken Under Submission
Date: 2021-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Case Management Conference re: Mediation Completion | ||
February 27, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
February 17, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
January 19, 2023 | Pre-Trial Settlement Conference | ||
August 25, 2022 | Hearing on Demurrer (Name Extension) | ||
August 25, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
June 13, 2022 | Jury Trial | ||
June 13, 2022 |
Judge: Complaint - Other |
||
June 03, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
June 03, 2022 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.