Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Birol, Nazan, Burastero, Paul, Burastero, Sharon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Birol, Nazan, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management136 days |
|
Filing DateJune 07, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial276 days |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Management Statement of Sharon Burastero, Paul Burastero Filed
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sharon Burastero, Paul Burastero Filed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/21/2019 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Nazan Birol
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sharon Burastero
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Nazan Birol Filed
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Nazan Birol
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Sharon Burastero, Paul Burastero Filed
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Nazan Birol
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Nazan Birol Filed
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 06/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.