Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Mildred L. Oliver, Oliver, Mildred L., filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against City Of Oakland, Oakland Police Department, represented by Quirk, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Civil Rights/Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mildred Oliver
Date: February 21, 2019Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 08, 2019Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 08, 2019General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff) Type: Without Hearing
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by: Mildred L. Oliver (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Opposition City of Oakland's Response to Pitchess Motion Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time: Result: Granted Result Date: 12/14/2021
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Shortening Time: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Updated -- Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Updated -- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support: As To Parties: removed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Seal Record Filed for Defendant: Result: Granted Result Date: 12/15/2021
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 07/08/2019 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mildred L. Oliver Filed
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Complaint - Civil Rights Filed (Amended)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for City of Oakland, Oakland Police Department
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mildred Oliver
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Response to Motion Filed
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Stipulated Protective Order Filed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion for Discovery Filed by Mildred L. Oliver
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion for Discovery Taken Under Submission
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service to the Def's reply to opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Filed for City of Oakland, Oakland Police Department
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Declaration of Rosemary O'Brien Filed
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time Granted
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for City of Oakland
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Letter re Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel Lizabeth N Devries Filed
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Reply to the Def's opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Declaration of Oakland Police Department's Custodian of Records Karolina Zachoszcz Filed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support Filed
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Motion for Discovery Granted
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 03/18/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mildred L. Oliver Filed
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support to the Def's reply to opposition to Plts MTN... Filed
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Jury Trial | ||
April 19, 2024 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
April 02, 2024 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
February 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | RG19007799: Oliver VS City of Oakland 02/01/2024 Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication in Department 25 Tentative Ruling - 02/01/2024 Jenna Whitman Parties to appear. The court is incline... | |
February 01, 2024 | Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication | ||
August 03, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Case Management Conference) Minute Order |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication scheduled for 02/01/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Event |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion of Summary Judgment/Adjudication scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/01/2024 03:00 PM Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.