Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Accesslex Institute, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Lagutaris , Deborah A, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions481 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: January 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Accesslex Institute
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 05/06/2020 02:31 PM D- 512
Date: February 07, 2020Limited Collections Order
Date: August 13, 2020Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Order to Show Cause Filed
Date: August 10, 2020Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/20/2020 09:00 AM D- 512
Date: May 06, 2020Proof of Service on Complaint As to Deborah A Lagutaris Filed
Date: March 19, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.