Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Leonard, Amanda, Sorenson, Michael, Vaughn, Carol, Vaughn, Chuck, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Kauffman, Anne, Kauffman, Nicholas, Leonard, Amanda, Mercury General Corporation, Sorenson, Michael, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with James R. Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames R. Reilly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateMay 23, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial140 days |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions597 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Denied
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Carol Vaughn, Chuck Vaughn Filed
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service of Supplemental Declaration of a. K. Loh in support of Filed
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Michael Sorenson, Amanda Leonard
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for Michael Sorenson, Amanda Leonard
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Letter re Selected Mediator Filed
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael Sorenson, Amanda Leonard Filed
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Carol Vaugh
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Declaration of Martin Zurada In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Nicholas Kauffman, Anne Kauffman
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Amanda Leonard, Nicholas Kauffman Filed
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Application Good Faith Settlement Filed for Michael Sorenson, Amanda Leonard - of Alice K Loh
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Substitute True Name for Doe Defendant Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Proof of Service Case Management Order dated 10/16/2019 Filed
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Motion for Joinder Granted
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Mercury General Corporation Filed
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Nicholas Kauffman
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Michael Sorenson, Amanda Leonard Filed
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Carol Vaugh, Chuck Vaugh
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail re Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support of Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement Filed
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Motion for Joinder Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Order to Confirm Good Faith Settlement Filed
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Answer to Amendment to Complaint Adding UIM Proceedings to Lawsuit Filed
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5 Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Via Email Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Reference to Prior Arrest Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proposed Exhibit List for Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.2 to Exclude Evidence that Describes the Parties' Med. Experts.. Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proposed Statement of Case for Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2 Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Demurrer - Overruled
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Statement Regarding Good Faith Settlement of Michael Sorenson and Amanda Leonard Filed
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Reply To Opposition RE: Motion To Join A Defendant Filed
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Proposed Jury Instrtuctions for Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3 Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proposed Special Verdict Form for Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Returned Check Issued AsTo Nicholas Kauffman, Anne Kauffman
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1 to Bar Witnesses from Testifying at Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Nicholas Kauffman, Anne Kauffman Filed
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Anne Kauffman
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4 Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Dept. 303 sign in sheet Filed
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6 Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Limited Non-Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 5 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Evidence of Any Collateral Sources Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Partial Settlement Filed
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 10 to Exclude Prior, Unrelated PTSD/Anxiety Issues Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Limited Non-Opposition to Defendants MIL #4 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Reference to Low Back Pain and Prior Treatment Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Dismissal As to Defendant: Mercury General Corporation Entered
Date: April 07, 2021Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Filed
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude References to Change of Employment or Change in Relationship with
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Email re: MIL 1 through 12; Proposed Witness List, Exh. List, Trial Brief, Jury
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Opposition To Motion In Limine No.11 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Objection to Deft's Remote Civil Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition To Motion In Limine No.10 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Plainitiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No.3 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.8 to Exclude Reference to Pltf's Prior Marriage and Divorce Filed
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail /E-Mail Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Plaintiff's Amended Proposed Witness List Filed
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Joint Proposed List of Jury Instructions for Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibit List Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5 to Prevent Def.s' and their Experts from Publishing or Admitting Med. Records
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6 to Prevent Def.s' from Commenting or Speculating Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Statement of the Case Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Opposition To Motion In Limine No.5 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Joint Witness List Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Opposition To Motion In Limine No.9 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4 to Prevent Def.s' Evidence of Insurance Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 11 to Exclude Reference to Prior Employment Claims or Legal Disputes Unrelated
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Proposed Juror Questionnaire for Trial Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Supplemental Voir Dire Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Witness List Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Joint Statement to Case Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 13 to Limit Testimony of Defense Biomechanical Expert Dr. Louis Cheng Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Plainitiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No.6 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 07/19/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: March 16, 2021Plainitiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 2 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition To Motion In Limine No.12 Filed
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint Issued
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Auto Tort As to Michael Sorenson, Amanda Leonard Filed
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail of First Amended Complaint, etc. Filed
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Determination that Settlement was Made in Good Faith
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Auto Tort As to Nicholas Kauffman, Anne Kauffman Filed
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Joinder Filed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Letter from Plaintiffs re Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Carol Vaughn, Chuck Vaughn Filed
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of Supplemental Declaration of A. K. Loh in support of Filed
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Carol Vaugh, Chuck Vaugh Filed
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Carol Vaugh, Chuck Vaugh
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by Mercury General Corporation
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 10/10/2018 09:00 AM D- 25
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - to File Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Nicholas Kauffman, Anne Kauffman
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Determination that Settlement was Made in good Faith
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Carol Vaugh, Chuck Vaugh Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of of Settlement Filed
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration in Support Stipulation to Continue Trial Filed
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Carol Vaugh, Chuck Vaugh Filed
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support Opposition Filed
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed (Amended)
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Joint Case Management Statement Filed
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Motion
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Carol Vaughn, Chuck Vaughn Filed
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.