Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Stallion Springs Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Christopher Robin Kelley, against Ama Lacy, Haralson Freeman, Ida Nanette, Ida Nanette Haralson Freeman, Nayaa Lacy, Olasebikan Freeman, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with Patrick R. McKinney II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick R. McKinney II Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management135 days |
Filing DateApril 24, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Time To Trial597 days |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Civil Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Amended Statement of The Case Filed
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Proposed Judgment Received
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Exhibit List with Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Witness List Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Provide a Private Court Reporter at Trial Filed
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 10/06/2021 01:30 PM D- 15
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Response To Request For Continuance Of Trial Date Filed
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Response to Def. Request for Continuance of Trial Date Filed
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Declaration in Support Pltff's Brief Re Conveyance of Real Property owned by a decedent Filed
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Brief Re: Conveyance of Real Property formerly owned by a Decedant, and right for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Granted
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Dept. 303 Sign in Sheet Filed
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Motion for Admissions Deemed Admitted Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/13/2020 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Denied
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Taken Under Submission
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Returned Mail: Case Management Order-Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Dropped
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Stallion Springs Trust
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Returned Mail: Case Management Order Filed
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Filed
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Publication As to Ida nanette Haralson Freeman, the Testate and Intestate Successors of Wil
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/16/2019 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Letter re Case Management Conference Filed
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Returned Mail: Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail re Order Directing Service of Summons of Complaint by Publication Filed
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/07/2019 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Returned Mail: CMC Order Filed
Date: 2019-01-16T00:00:00Order Directing Service of Summons by Publication Filed
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Granted
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Stallion Springs Trust
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Returned Mail: Order O Court Fee Waiver Filed
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Stallion Springs Trust
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Ida nanette Haralson Freeman
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Stallion Springs Trust Filed
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ida nanette Haralson Freeman Filed
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/06/2018 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stallion Springs Trust
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement RCD / Department 15 |
|
May 09, 2022 | Court Trial | ||
May 03, 2022 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
April 29, 2022 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
April 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF ALAMEDA RG18902069: Stallion Springs Trust VS Haralson Freeman 12/21/2021 Court Trial in Department 15 Tentative Ruling ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT The Court has o... | |
April 04, 2022 | Court Trial | ||
March 24, 2022 | Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial | ||
March 24, 2022 | Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Substitute Successors in Interest | ||
March 24, 2022 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
March 16, 2022 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.