Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kim, Jin Kwan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Absolute Medical, Inc, Herschmann, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time184 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: April 03, 2018Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: April 03, 2018Case Management Statement of JIN KWAN KIM Filed
Date: August 10, 2018Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed
Date: October 04, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for JIN KWAN KIM
Date: April 03, 2018Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: April 05, 2018Initial Case Management Conference 08/22/2018 09:30 AM D- 520
Date: April 05, 2018Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 10, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.