Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kenneth W.Morris,Trustee, Silverado Contractors, Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Kenneth W.Morris,Trustee, represented by Jones, Otis L., Otis L. Jones, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen M. Pulido presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen M. Pulido Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management136 days |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil (Other Real Property (Not Emin...) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions638 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: June 28, 2018Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 26, 2018Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: July 06, 2018Summons on Complaint Issued
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Motion to Stay Proceedings Hearing Confirmed for 06/28/2018 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for SILVERADOCONTRACTORS,INC
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Motion to Stay Proceedings Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous Dept. 301 Sign-In Sheet Filed
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Stay Filed
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 07/26/2018 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/05/2018 09:30 AM D- 301
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed for KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE (Amended)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00General Denial to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Motion to Stay Proceedings Denied
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint - Dropped
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint 10/30/2018 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint 10/30/2018 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Cross Complainant
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance Filed for SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Discovery and Request for Sanctions Fi
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance Granted
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to William Crotinger Filed
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Filed
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to Peter Knuth Filed
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Letter from Miller Starr Regalia Filed
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Opposition Filed
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Amend Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Demurrer and Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint Filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike to First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Demurrer to first amended cross-complaint Filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Demurrer
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Declaration of Otis L. Jones, Esq. In Support of Opposition Filed by KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed for KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Order to Allow Filing of Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition Filed by KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, I
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Opposition to Notice of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Opposition to Mtn to Strike Filed
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Answer to 2nd Amended Complaint Filed for KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Demurrer - Overruled
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Demurrer and Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint Denied
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Declaration of Otis L. Joses. Esq. in Support Filed by KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration ISO Opposition to Mtn to Strike Filed
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike Complaint Denied
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Motion to Amend 01/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 517
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Cross-Complaint Granted
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00Demurrer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike Complaint Filed for Defendant
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Opposition To Motion To Strike Filed
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Cross-Complaint Filed for SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Cross-Complaint Filed for SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Opposition to Pltf Notice of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Cross Complainant
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration ISO Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint - Overruled
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike Complaint - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Amend Granted
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike Second Ameded Cross-Complaint Filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint Filed by KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Opposition to Mtn to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint - Granted in Part
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion of its Demurrer to Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Cross Complainant
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Objections of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Opposition Response Filed
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Reply Brief ISO demurrer Filed
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Subpoena of Leah Dun
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Third Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Answer to Amended Cross-Complaint Filed for SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Subpoena of Audree J
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Demurrer Filed by KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Demurrer to Cross-Complaint Filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Proposed Order Filed
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Response Filed
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Strike - Dropped
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Demurrer Sustained W/O Leave to Amend As To Party
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer Filed
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion in Support of Motion to Strike Second Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Objection to the Judgment Filed
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Reply Brief ISO Mtn to Strike Filed
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement of SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC Filed
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE Filed
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition Filed by KENNETH W.MORRIS,TRUSTEE
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) - Dropped
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order Filed
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00Proposed Order Received
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
June 16, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
May 23, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
May 01, 2023 | Jury Trial | ||
April 21, 2023 | Pre-Trial Conference | ||
April 18, 2023 | Hearing on Motion to Strike Defendant Kenneth W. Morris' Fourth Amended Cross-Complaint; filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC (Cross-Defendant) | ||
April 18, 2023 | Hearing on Demurrer (Name Extension) filed by SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC (Cross-Defendant) | ||
April 11, 2023 | Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) | ||
March 21, 2023 | Case Management Conference | ||
February 09, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | RG18896275: SILVERADO CONTRACTORS, INC VS KENNETH W. MORRIS,TRUSTEE 02/09/2023 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment in Department 517 Tentative Ruling - 02/07/2023 Somnath Raj Chatterjee The Motion ... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.