Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Johnson, Antone, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2018 |
CategoryCollections - Reduced Fee (B&P 6322.1) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Declaration of Venue Filed
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Antone Johnson Filed
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 10/04/2019 09:00 AM D- 511
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Limited Collections Order
Date: March 31, 2020Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: December 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to B&P 6322.1 Filed
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: July 02, 2020Collections - Reduced Fee (B&P 6322.1) Filed
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Limited Collections Order
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Limited Collections Order
Date: July 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.