Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moore, Gregory, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Bankhead, Keith Donnell, Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Paul D. Herbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul D. Herbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial392 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1083 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 01/24/2018 03:00 PM D- 20
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gregory Moore
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Keith Donnell Bankhead Filed
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Keith Donnell Bankhead Filed
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Keith Donnell Bankhead Rejected
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Keith Donnell Bankhead Filed
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2019-10-09T00:00:00Proof of Service Default Judgment Filed
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Keith Donnell Bankhead Filed - re Sta
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service Statement of damages, etc. Filed
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Withdrawal of the Notice of Settlement and Order
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Keith Donnell Bankhead Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Keith Donnell Bankhead Filed
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Fi
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Reply to Order to Show Cause Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 23, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Gregory Moore Filed
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: August 23, 2021Tentative Case Management Order
Date: August 20, 2021Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.