Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Muett VS Beban

Case Last Refreshed: 5 months

Case Overview

On August 28, 2017 A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

August 28, 2017

Last Refreshed

Feb 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Auto Tort

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Cycle Time

431 days

Time To Management

147 days

Time To Trial

147 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 11/05/2018 09:30 AM D- 301
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 11/26/2018 10:00 AM D- 15
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 11/16/2018 09:30 AM D- 15
Docket Event Compliance Hearing 12/04/2018 03:00 PM D- 15
Docket Event Notice of Settlement Filed for Jose Manuel Muett
Docket Event Notice of of Change of Handling Attorney Filed
Docket Event Hearing Vacated: Compliance Hearing 03/23/2018 09:30 AM D- 15
Docket Event Declaration Of William E. Weiss RE: OSC And Monetary Sanctions Filed
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.