Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kelsey, Justine, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Dsquared2 Inc., Dsquared2 Retail La Inc., Santiago , Fabian, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Patrick J. Zika presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick J. Zika Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management195 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Time To Trial195 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time663 days |
Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 05/15/2017 03:00 PM D- 22
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Justine Kelsey
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Complaint - Other Employment Filed
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dsquared2 Inc. Filed
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Dsquared2 Inc., DSquared2 Retail LA Inc.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Justine Kelsey Filed
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dsquared2 Inc. Filed
Date: 2017-01-09T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/12/2017 03:00 PM D- 22
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dsquared2 Inc., Dsquared2 Inc. Filed
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Dsquared2 Inc., DSquared2 Retail LA Inc. Filed
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: July 16, 2018Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Dsquared2 Inc.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Justine Kelsey
Date: July 17, 2018Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: for an Order Pursuant to Stipulation to Extend Discover, and
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/09/2018 09:00 AM D- 302
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 10/24/2018 03:00 PM D- 22
Date: July 17, 2018Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 08/20/2018 08:30 AM D- 22
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Dsquared2 Inc., DSquared2 Retail LA Inc. Filed
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 16, 2018Settlement Conference Statement of Justine Kelsey Filed
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: October 23, 2018Miscellaneous Filed
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.