Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bbbb Bonding Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Coria, Jeanette Valverde, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Evelio M. Grillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEvelio M. Grillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2016 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions307 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time919 days |
Civil Order of Examination Issued
Date: July 23, 2018Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jeanette Valverde Coria Filed
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Civil Order of Examination Issued
Date: April 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail Request for Default Filed
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Jeanette Valverde Coria Filed
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 02/15/2017 09:01 AM D- 1A
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Default Judgment (Money) Entered
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for BBBB Bonding Corporation
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Compliance Hearing 08/17/2016 09:00 AM D- 14
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Jeanette Valverde Coria Filed
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Jeanette Valverde Coria Filed
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing
Date: October 12, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.