Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Adeline Corporation, Adnan Turcinovic, Security National Insurance Company, Turcinovic , Adnan, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Adeline Corporation, Yang & Lee Llc, represented by Gregory R Delapena, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Delbert C. Gee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelbert C. Gee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management1381 days |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2015 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial1368 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: August 03, 2020Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: March 16, 2020Case Management Statement Filed by: Adeline Corporation (Defendant)
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00List of Witness Filed
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 10/15/2019 09:30 AM D- 514
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 04/15/2016 09:00 AM D- 19
Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Statement proposed statement of the case Filed
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Adnan Turcinovic Filed
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/13/2016 09:30 AM D- 19
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 09/20/2019 10:30 AM D- 514
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 09/10/2019 02:00 PM D- 303
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial 09/23/2019 09:15 AM D- 514
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Request for Informal Discovery Conference Filed
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Proposed Verdict Forms Filed
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial 09/04/2019 09:30 AM D- 514
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00List of Witness Filed
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Proposed Statement of the Case Filed
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Master POS Filed
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Order Filed
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Order Pretrial Order Filed
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Settlement Conference Statement of Adeline Corporation Filed
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Order to Consolidate Cases Filed
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Proposed Juryn Instructions Filed
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed for Adnan Turcinovic
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Adnan Turcinovic
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Letter from H. Mal Cameron Filed
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Dept. 303 Sign in Sheet Filed
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 08/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 514
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine # 1 to Preclude Testimony of Young Man Kim Filed
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine #4 Filed
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine # 2 to Preclude Evidence that Young Man Kim was an Independent Contractor Filed
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 03/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 514
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed by Adnan Turcinovic
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Order Trial Setting Order Filed
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Reply Brief in Support of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Dept. 301 Sign in Sheet Filed
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 02/28/2020 09:00 AM D- 514
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 03/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 514
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Order Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine #3 Filed
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Supplemental Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Plaintiff's Misdemeanor Conviction Filed
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine Limine #3 Filed
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 03:00 PM D- 514
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Adnan Turcinovic Filed
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/04/2020 08:30 PM D- 514
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine #1 Filed
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Neuropsychological Independent Medical Exam
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Waiver of Five Year Limit Which Action Must be Brought to Trial Filed
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/03/2020 01:30 PM D- 514
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Declaration of R. Wesley Pratt in Response to OSC Filed
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Adeline Corporation
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Adnan Turcinovic Filed
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Received
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Adeline Corporation Filed
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Adeline Corporation Filed
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Adeline Corporation Filed
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Declaration in Response to Order to Show Cause Filed
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Adeline Corporation Filed
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Tentative Case Management Order
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2022 | Jury Trial | ||
January 07, 2022 |
Judge: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort |
||
January 05, 2022 | Case Management Conference | ||
January 05, 2022 |
Judge: Case Management Conference |
||
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Settlement Conference scheduled for 12/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 301 updated: Result Date to 12/23/2021 Result Type to Held Event |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Pre-Trial Settlement Conference) Minute Order |
|
December 23, 2021 |
Judge: Settlement Conference |
||
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other - (*Judge's Memo to Clerk - PTSC: Case settled) Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by: Adeline Corporation (Defendant) Document |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTE: (*Further MSC set for December 23, 2021 in D-301 at 9:00AM via BlueJeans Video Conference) Case Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.