Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Montenero, Ernesto, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Morris , Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Ioana Petrou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIoana Petrou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management135 days |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2015 |
CategoryAuto Tort |
Time To Trial135 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time514 days |
Answer to Complaint Filed for Kevin Morris
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 03/02/2016 09:15 AM D- 15
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Kevin Morris Filed
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Notice of of Errata to Complaint Filed
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted
Date: November 09, 2016Declaration of Mailing Filed
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed for Ernesto Montenero
Date: March 13, 2017Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Kevin Morris Filed
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00Complaint - Auto Tort Filed
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Order Civil Trial Re-Setting Order Filed
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Declaration of Diligence to Effect Personal Service Filed
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Mediator Selection Filed
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Objection to Notice of Time and Place of Trial Filed
Date: 2016-02-26T00:00:00Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 16, 2017Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Application Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Kevin Morris
Date: November 09, 2016Proposed Order Received
Date: November 09, 2016Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Ernesto Montenero Filed
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Order Filed
Date: November 14, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ernesto Montenero
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Association of Attorneys Filed
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.