Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Starr VS Alameda County Jail

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months, 3 weeks

Case Overview

On October 29, 2014 A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

October 29, 2014

Last Refreshed

Feb 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Other PI/PD/WD Tort

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

General Torts

Case Cycle Time

748 days

Time To Management

2 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Plaintiff

Defendant

Defendant

See all parties

Case Documents

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/02/2016 09:30 AM D- 15
Docket Event Letter re Request for Continuance- GRANTED Filed
Docket Event Letter re Request for Continuance Filed
Docket Event Letter re Request for Order for Name Correction Filed
Docket Event Letter re Request for Continuance Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/29/2016 09:15 AM D- 15
Case Management Conference

judge: Ioana Petrou

Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 05/25/2016 09:15 AM D- 15
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Continue

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Continue

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Continue

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.