Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Samuel, Stuart, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Browner, James, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 25, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions11 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time238 days |
Default Judgment: Clerk's UD (CCP 1169) Entered
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for James Browner
Date: 2014-11-06T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stuart Samuel
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for James Browner
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to James Browner Filed
Date: 2014-09-03T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169) As To James Browner Filed
Date: 2014-09-05T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: 2014-11-06T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for James Browner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: April 20, 2015Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for James Browner
Date: January 07, 2015Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for James Browner
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Filed for James Browner
Date: 2014-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: January 15, 2015Declaration Filed
Date: January 15, 2015Application Re: Stay of Execution (UD - Possession) Conditionally Granted, no further Stays
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed
Date: January 08, 2015Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 03, 2015Declaration Filed
Date: January 08, 2015Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Release of Funds Issued and Filed
Date: January 08, 2015Writ of Possession - Unsatisfied Filed
Date: February 20, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.