Search anything: judges, parties, opposing counsel, motion types, legal issues

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Wilson VS Dikes

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month, 4 weeks

Case Overview

On November 6, 2013 A Civil case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alameda County.

Case Details

Case Number

(Subscribe to View)

Filing Date

November 6, 2013

Last Refreshed

Feb 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Auto Tort

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Automobile

Case Cycle Time

869 days

Time To Management

139 days

Time To Trial

334 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Case History

Type Title - Description Documents
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
Docket Event Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Docket Event Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 05/03/2016 03:30 PM D- 303
Docket Event Civil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 522 date: 04/11/2016 time: 08:45 AM
Docket Event Compliance Hearing 05/03/2016 03:30 PM D- 522
Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 522 date: 03/29/2016 time: 02:30 PM
Docket Event Notice of Settlement Filed for Christopher J Wilson
Case Management Conference

judge: Dennis Hayashi

Docket Event Case Management Conf Continuance 03/29/2016 02:30 PM D- 522
Docket Event Case Management Conference Order Issued
Showing See all events

Document Requested

Your request has been received. We will email you this document within 4 business hours.

You have used out of 0 document requests left today

Document Requested

You have exceeded your document request limit for today.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

Docket Refresh Requested

Your docket refresh request has been received. You will receive a notification when the docket is refreshed.

Docket Refresh Requested

A refresh is already in progress.

If you need immediate assistance, please contact [email protected]

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.

Please wait a moment while we load this page.