Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vasconcellos, John, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Sara Lee Bakery, Mckinney, Gary, Diaz, Rick, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Cecilia P. Castellanos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCecilia P. Castellanos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management138 days |
Filing DateMay 01, 2013 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time518 days |
Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2013-05-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Vasconcellos
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Complaint - Wrongful Termination Filed
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sara Lee Bakery Filed
Date: 2013-05-17T00:00:00Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: September 23, 2014Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Rick Diaz Filed
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Initial Case Management Conference 09/16/2013 02:30 PM D- 516
Date: 2013-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 16, 2013Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: September 16, 2013Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: October 01, 2014Not Found or Non Service Return Filed
Date: 2013-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Removal Filed for Sara Lee Bakery, Gary Mckinney, Rick Diaz
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: September 23, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.