Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Orvik, Leslie R., in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2012 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time405 days |
Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: April 12, 2012Proof of Service on Complaint As to Leslie R. Orvik Filed
Date: May 01, 2012Complaint - Collections Filed
Date: April 12, 2012Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Leslie R. Orvik Filed
Date: July 25, 2012Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: May 22, 2013Compliance Hearing 05/29/2013 01:30 PM D- 14
Date: April 08, 2013Proof of Service on Complaint As to Leslie R. Orvik Filed
Date: June 07, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Citibank
Date: April 12, 2012Declaration Pursuant to CCP 395 (b) Venue of Personal, Family or Household Obligations Filed
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.