Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Neft, Stuart, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Guevera, Ignacio, Guevera, Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time91 days |
Answer to Complaint Filed for Ignacio Guevera, Kathleen Guevera
Date: January 18, 2011Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ignacio Guevera Filed
Date: January 03, 2011Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed
Date: December 16, 2010Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed
Date: March 17, 2011Initial Case Management Conference 05/02/2011 09:00 AM D- 16
Date: December 21, 2010Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: December 21, 2010Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: December 16, 2010Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stuart Neft
Date: December 16, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.