Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hung, Lynda, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Chiappelli, Akia, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Taylor Culver presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTaylor Culver Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2010 |
CategoryCh-100 Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time25 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2010 |
Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment
Judge: Taylor Culver |
||
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed | |
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Commenced and Completed | |
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration of Diligence Filed | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Amended Civil Harassment Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment 10/26/2010 09:00 AM D- 102 | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Harassment and Temporary Restraining Order Filed for Petitioner | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Filed | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Notice For Ex Parte Application For Order Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.